TYNE AND WEAR EDUCATION BUSINESS LINK ORGANISATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TWEBLO was established in 2001 as a not for profit company with charitable status and limited by guarantee, responsible for contracting, policy and strategic management of EBL delivery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 13 December 2001: Standard registration
- 01 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £880.24k | £806.96k | £455.77k | £276.30k | £77.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00m | £825.70k | £424.54k | £300.42k | £257.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £45.54k | £72.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £820.30k | £727.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.39k | £7.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £962.20k | £797.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.23k | £26.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £14.98k | £1.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 10 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 10 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 06 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 13 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 11 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 14 December 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 FEBRUARY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 APRIL 2001 AND 10 OCTOBER 2001. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION PRIMARILY OF YOUNG PERSONS WITHIN THE AGE RANGE OF FIVE TO NINETEEN YEARS OLD ("THE PRIMARY BENEFICIARIES"), PRIMARILY IN THE AREA OF TYNE AND WEAR COMPRISING THE ADMINISTRATIVE AREAS AT THE DATE OF ADOPTION OF THIS MEMORANDUM OF THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGHS OF GATESHEAD, NORTH TYNESIDE AND SOUTH TYNESIDE AND THE CITIES OF NEWCASTLE AND SUNDERLAND ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ENHANCE THEIR OPPORTUNITIES OF ACCESS TO FURTHER EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT;
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY THE AREA OF TYNE AND WEAR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window