MARCHER APPLE NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Identify and propagate old & rare varieties of apples & pears in English & Welsh border counties. Supply graftwood to people wishing to plant such trees. Publish books & CDs giving pomological advice. Encourage local primary school children to use a recently acquired site-a-gift for environmental educational purposes. Attend shows to disseminate information and give talks to various groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Herefordshire
- Powys
- Shropshire
- Worcestershire
- Australia
- Canada
- France
- Ireland
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 20 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stephen Ainsleigh Rice | Chair | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Bustin | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Richards-Price | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Nason | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Hugh Thursfield Smith | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Pillow | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.81k | £26.77k | £17.78k | £13.65k | £12.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.43k | £19.53k | £21.40k | £16.85k | £16.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 NOV 2014 as amended on 19 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH, IDENTIFICATION AND CONSERVATION BY ANY RECOGNISED MEANS, OF OLD VARIETIES OF APPLES, PEARS AND OTHER FRUITS FOUND GROWING IN THE MARCHES AREA OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AND ELSEWHERE, AND TO MAKE COLLECTED INFORMATION AVAILABLE TO INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS BY DISPLAYS, DEMONSTRATIONS, TALKS OR ANY OTHER COMMUNICATION SYSTEM
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROCK HOUSE
PELHAM ROAD
UPTON MAGNA
SHREWSBURY
SY4 4UA
- Phone:
- 07753929253
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window