TRIMSARAN FAMILY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a resource and advice centre which provides recreation and leisure activities to promote good family relationships and relieve stress within families. To preserve and protect health. Provide education of the public in good parenting skills for the interests of social welfare with a view to improving family life conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 24 August 2001: Standard registration
- BOBOL BACH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULINE BOWERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
Naomi Jane Wilmot | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr KIM VANESSA BROOM | Trustee | 08 February 1923 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.05k | £44.09k | £25.86k | £35.61k | £35.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.17k | £21.90k | £31.13k | £26.67k | £26.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 FEBRUARY 2001.
Charitable objects
I. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS WITHIN FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS BY THE PROVISION OF A RESOURCE AND ADVICE CENTRE AND BY THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GOOD PARENTING SKILLS. II. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE .
Area of benefit
TRIMSARAN AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trimsaran Multipurpose Hall
Heol Llanelli
Trimsaran
KIDWELLY
Dyfed
SA17 4AA
- Phone:
- +447377428083
- Email:
- trimsaranfc512@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window