DO WELL FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity as contained in its memorandum of association are to make grants for such charitable, literary and educational purposes as are exclusively charitable under the laws of England and Wales
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 12 June 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr AMANDA FOREMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUSTIN EDWARDS MAGNUS SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORD HARRY DALMENY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LADY CAROLINE DALMENY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN LUKE ELLIOTT BARTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.08k | £37.04k | £13.61k | £31.79k | £28.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.11k | £29.47k | £7.04k | £30.02k | £34.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 20 DECEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 15 MAY 2001
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE, LITERARY AND EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 BISHOPS ROAD
LONDON
SW6 7AR
- Phone:
- 02077367302
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window