Financial history THE FRIENDS OF HOLY INNOCENTS CHURCH, LAMARSH

Charity number: 1088711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.28k £5.11k £4.39k £8.01k £5.51k
Total expenditure £3.74k £1.12k £2.19k £19.34k £2.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A