BEDFORDSHIRE AFRICAN SUPPORT PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bedfordshire African Support Project is a grassrrot organisation that work for and with the African and other communities to provide employment, welfare benefits, debt/money advice and also organise community events like sporting and leisure activities. We also promote education and well-being to women and children living in some part of sub-Saharan Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Angola
- Congo
- Malawi
- Zambia
Governance
- 22 January 2002: Standard registration
- 02 June 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BEDFORDSHIRE CONGOLESE COMMUNITY LINKS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2005 | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.28k | £102.38k | £107.85k | £117.42k | £83.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.66k | £102.84k | £106.09k | £110.02k | £74.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 29 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | 29 May 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 28 May 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 28 May 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 21 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 21 May 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED 20 OCTOBER 2001, 29 JUNE 2002 & 9 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE RELIEF OF ALL PEOPLE FROM THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO, REPUBLIC OF CONGO, ANGOLA AND OTHER AREAS OF THE BLACK AFRICAN SUB-CONTINENT WHO ARE NOW LIVING IN BEDFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE: IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED OR INFIRM BY RELIEVING THEIR SUFFERING OR ASSISTING THEIR RECOVERY. 2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE CHILDREN AND WOMEN RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN COUNTRIES OF SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN AND WOMEN RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN COUNTRIES OF SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, MATERIALS AND EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
PERSONS FROM THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO, REPUBLIC OF CONGO, ANGOLA AND OTHER BLACK AFRICAN SUB-CONTINENT NOW LIVING IN BEDFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window