VINEYARD MUSIC (UK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the comapnay is the promotion of knowledge of the Christain faith by sales of Christian literature and audio material by mail order, the production of Christian worship songs and delivery of training for the furtherance of the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 July 2001: Standard registration
- VINEYARD RECORDS UK (Working name)
- Vineyard Worship UK and Ireland (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE SILLITO | Chair | 10 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Kim Hurst | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholl Elliott | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER WHITELOCK | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|||||||
Audrenneive Alareen Farrell | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £443.81k | £282.33k | £325.27k | £433.86k | £407.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £453.97k | £186.87k | £206.62k | £267.76k | £171.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 20TH JULY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 19 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY THE DOCUMENTING, RECORDING AND DISTRIBUTION BY WAY OF PRINTED, AUDIO, VIDEO, DIGITAL AND ELECTRONIC MEDIA OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP MUSIC WRITTEN AND COMPOSED PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN MEMBER CHURCHES OF THE ASSOCIATION OF VINEYARD CHURCHES (UK) TRUST AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF CHURCH PLANTING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. 2. THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION BY WAY OF SEMINARS AND CONFERENCES. 3. THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 4. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES AND INSTITUTIONS AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 8
K3 Business Park
200 Clough Road
Hull
HU5 1SW
- Phone:
- 01482462690
- Email:
- hello@vineyardworship.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window