Accounts and annual returns RICHARD OVERALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1088640
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2020 01 June 2021 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 28 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required