Financial history SAGE COUNSELLING

Charity Number: 1088917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £28.21k £23.19k £31.99k £34.44k £28.54k
Total expenditure £29.87k £29.43k £26.92k £26.28k £24.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £613 N/A N/A N/A N/A