THE SUNBIRD TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates predominately in India, but also in Sri Lanka and South Africa. It supports and facilitates projects that have already been set up by local people for the benefit of their own communities for the relief of poverty., sickness and distress, and for the advancement of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
- Namibia
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 10 January 2002: Standard registration
- 14 May 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.13k | £4.08k | £6.18k | £12.28k | £3.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.31k | £10.12k | £1.99k | £9.96k | £14.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 26 April 2015 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 27 February 2014 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 10 May 2013 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) 1) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS 2) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window