HARVESTIME MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Governance
- 18 July 2001: Standard registration
- 02 August 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16 | £5.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £742 | £7.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 16 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 23 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 11 November 2005 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 20TH DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF RELIGIOUS RADIO BROADCASTING, AND BY RUNNING COURSES OF BIBLE STUDY AND EVANGELISTIC TRAINING COURSES FOR THE CHURCH LEADERS.
Area of benefit
AFRICA - SUB SAHARAN COUNTRIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window