ST JOHN'S SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St John's PTA raises money to provide facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 December 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Callum Murdoch | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Katherine McKenna | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Victoria Lawton | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Desbottes | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grigg Tim Mr | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Turnbull | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carly Hunter | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.69k | £3.94k | £11.96k | £12.17k | £11.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.30k | £11.06k | £5.12k | £11.88k | £13.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 July 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JANUARY 2001 AS AMENDED 20 SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ST JOHN'S CE PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JOHNS C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
WHICHERS GATE ROAD
ROWLAND'S CASTLE
PO9 6BB
- Phone:
- 02392412095
- Email:
- treasurer@stjohnspta.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window