DINGLE COMMUNITY REGENERATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 19 September 2001: Standard registration
- 08 January 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DCRT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 24 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 24 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE AND IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT LIMITATION AS CONNECTED WITH URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE NEEDS OF THE DINGLE AREA OF THE CITY OF LIVERPOOL BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS-: A) PROVISION OF ADVICE AND TRAINING TO UNEMPLOYED INDIVIDUALS CONCERNING UNEMPLOYMENT, SELF EMPLOYMENT, AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF CO- OPERATIVE ENTERPRISES AND THE PROVISION OF CV WRITING, JOB SEARCH AND JOB CLUB FACILITIES FOR THEM; B) PROVISION OF PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE BY WAY OF ACCOMMODATION, CHILDCARE FACILITIES OR ASSISTANCE WITH TRAVEL; C) PROVISION OF LAND AND BUILDING AT BELOW MARKET RATE OR SUBSIDISED RENTS TO BUSINESSES STARTING UP; D) PROVISION OF CAPITAL GRANTS FOR EQUIPMENT TO NEW BUSINESSES; E) PAYMENT TO EXISTING COMMERCIAL BUSINESSES TO TAKE ON ADDITIONAL STAFF FROM AMONGST UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE. F)TO PROMOTE EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES WITH SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON PROVIDING ACCESS TO SUCH OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE BY REASON OF SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE ARE OTHERWISE UNABLE TO GAIN SUCH ACCESS G) TO PROVIDE ADVICE, INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE IN RELATION TO GOOD CITIZENSHIP SO AS TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND POTENTIAL OF INDIVIDUALS AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED H) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF THOSE WHO ARE IN DANGER OF BECOMING ADDICTED TO OR DEPENDENT UPON OR THOSE WHO HAVE ALREADY BECOME ADDICTED OR DEPENDENT UPON LEGAL OR ILLEGAL DRUGS OF ANY DESCRIPTION I) TO RELIEVE HOUSING NEED BY:- A) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION TO THOSE IN CIRCUMSTANCES OF HOUSING NEED; B) FACILITATING THE PROVISION AND IMPROVEMENT OF PUBLIC SECTOR HOUSING THROUGH CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER AGENCIES. J) TO PROVIDE OR PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED THROUGH CO- OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER AGENCIES K) TO RELIEVE POVERTY L) TO PROTECT, ENHANCE AND CONSERVE THE ENVIRONMENT M) TO PROVIDE PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILD CARE N) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME O )SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
DINGLE CITY OF LIVERPOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window