OADBY SEVAK SAMAJ
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) Luncheon club - meets once every week on Thursdays (for ethnic elderly) 2) Also organise tours (coach) to coast, shopping, temples etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 12 July 2001: Standard registration
- 23 October 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.43k | £5.32k | £0 | £3.11k | £4.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.43k | £6.95k | £0 | £3.62k | £4.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JUNE 1998 AS AMENDED 11 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY ASIAN PERSONS RESIDENT IN OADBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS HEREINAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF A LUNCHEON CLUB FOR THE SAID PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH PROVISION BY REASON OF THEIR AGE AND OR INFIRMITY
Area of benefit
OADBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window