SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST MENTAL HEALTH TRAINING/EQUIPMENT FUND
Charity number: 1053793-28
Removed charity
Charity overview
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/09/1996
AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000
AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005
AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010
Charitable objects
APPLY THE INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION SO FAR AS MAY BE PERMISSIBLE THE CAPITAL FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PATIENTS WHO ARE TREATED BY THE MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE AT SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND TRAINING THAT PROMOTES THE EFFICIENT PERFORMANCE OF THEIR DUTIES BY THE STAFF AT THAT SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 10 April 2001: Standard registration
- 26 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON MENTAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST MENTAL HEALTH TRAINING/EQUIPMENT FUND (Previous name)
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON COMMUNITY NHS TRUST MENTAL HEALTH TRAINING/EQUIPMENT FUND (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.