Financial history FIRST PEDMORE GUIDES

Charity Number: 1086175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £975 £1.37k £6.36k £5.36k £8.36k
Total expenditure £871 £1.07k £5.95k £5.49k £7.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A