FIRST PEDMORE BROWNIES

Charity number: 1086157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

running a brownie unit under the regulations of the Guide Association

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £5,386
Total expenditure: £5,350

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Dudley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 April 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VICTORIA Halford Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
REBECCA WILSON Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
Jacqueline FORREST Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.71k £1.53k £3.15k £4.73k £5.39k
Total expenditure £2.59k £1.87k £2.94k £4.42k £5.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 27 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Poppyfields
The Paddock
Stourbridge
Stourbridge
West Midlands
DY9 0RE
Phone:
01562882275
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available