THE GAMBIA UNITED SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a UK Gambian based charity, helping the poor in the Gambia and here in the UK. We help in areas: Health, Education, Cultural awareness, Arts and Legal advice. We have recently donated thousands of mosquito nets to the poor in the Gambia for free distribution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- The Gambia
Governance
- 28 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IDA SANYANG-JAITEH | Chair | 22 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
EBRIMA JATTA | Trustee | 22 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
BAKARY SINGHATEH | Trustee | 22 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
SULAYMAN CAMARA | Trustee | 22 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.93k | £973 | £626 | £3.68k | £1.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.52k | £1.69k | £626 | £4.65k | £941 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 August 2023 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 25 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 25TH SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION AMONG CITIZENS OF THE GAMBIA AND/OR THOSE OF GAMBIAN ORIGIN OR DESCENT, BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY BODIES, NGO'S, OTHER AGENCIES AND SAID INDIVIDUALS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SAID INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
GAMBIA, UK AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clockhouse Community Centre
Defiance Walk
Woolwich
LONDON
SE18 5QL
- Phone:
- 07526636682
- Email:
- info@gambiaunitedsociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window