Accounts and annual returns THE WILLIAM ROBERTS SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1090538
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2013 23 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2012 31 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2012 Not Required