SIYA PHULAPHULA "WE LISTEN"

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports mental health training for South Africans who work with disadvantaged children and families in South Africa. This is accomplished by providing bloc training courses in London for South Africans as well as sponsoring UK teachers to visit South Africa twice yearly to support and consult to community projects. All costs of travelling and subsistence are also provided.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- South Africa
Governance
- 23 November 2001: Standard registration
- SIYA PHULAPHULA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN MALKIN | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Segal | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL JULIAN RUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ANTON OBHOLZER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £5 | £2 | £23 | £121 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.35k | £2.10k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13TH AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING PARTICULARLY TO COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND OTHERS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 DARTMOUTH ROAD
LONDON
NW2 4EX
- Phone:
- 02084527151
- Email:
- ann.s.malkin@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window