Accounts and annual returns RELATE SOUTH WEST HAMPSHIRE AND THE ISLE OF WIGHT

Charity Number: 1087082
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2020 19 January 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 03 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 10 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 10 December 2018 On Time