Financial history RELATE SOUTH WEST HAMPSHIRE AND THE ISLE OF WIGHT

Charity Number: 1087082
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £272.19k £282.49k £226.19k £0 £0
Total expenditure £267.17k £271.91k £280.75k £78.53k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £7.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £41.36k £44.26k £107.07k N/A N/A