LYNG COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of rented affordable housing on the Lyng estate in West Bromwich following the demolition of existing housing .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,347,155
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.25m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £98.38k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£918,537
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £918.54k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £918.54k | |
Retained for future use | £428.62k |
People

5 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sandwell
Governance
- 31 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS WENDY BODENHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Josh Fenton | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Sikdar | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Naresh Bhatoe | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr SELINA TOUR | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN HICKSON | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|||||
JOHN EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HANNAH PATRICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.93k | £1.12m | £1.13m | £1.22m | £1.35m | |
|
Total expenditure | £677.42k | £761.27k | £800.24k | £839.02k | £918.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.10m | £1.13m | £1.17m | £1.25m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £10.45k | £3.81k | £44.51k | £98.38k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £12.92k | £497 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £761.27k | £800.24k | £839.02k | £918.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £9.67m | £9.47m | £9.27m | £9.16m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £3.08m | £3.32m | £3.64m | £3.98m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £9.54m | £9.25m | £8.99m | £8.79m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/04/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/02/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/05/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE: 4.1 TO PROVIDE SOCIAL HOUSING, HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 4.2 TO PROVIDE FOR AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF SOCIAL HOUSING, HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND SERVICES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 4.3 TO PROVIDE SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF AND PROVIDE ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 4.4 TO PROVIDE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK PRIMARILY ON THE LYNG ESTATE AND ANY OTHER AREA WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SANDWELL; 4.5 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK PRIMARILY ON THE LYNG ESTATE AND ANY OTHER AREA WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SANDWELL; 4.6 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 4.7 THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK PRIMARILY ON THE LYNG ESTATE AND ANY OTHER AREA WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SANDWELL) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 4.7.1 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (A) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (B) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES, 4.7.2 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 4.7.3 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 4.7.4 THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 4.7.5 THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; 4.7.6 THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; 4.7.7 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; 4.7.8 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY THE LYNG ESTATE AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SANDWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Frank Fisher Way
West Bromwich
B70 7AW
- Phone:
- 01215255969
- Email:
- lyngcomm@btconnect.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window