THE CHARITY CHANNEL

Charity number: 1093256
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity Channel provides events pomotions for charities and charitable organisations. It also provides training to charities in modern media, web and television broadcasting, allowing charities to understand the benfits of promoting their organisations in this way.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 August 2002: Standard registration
  • 13 May 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required