Trustees RIVERHEAD INFANTS' SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1086548

Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIINA MUTRU | Chair | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Milne | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Billing | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael May | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Lee | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew King | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Skinner | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Swain | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Munns | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Pocknall | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karl Fuhrmann | Trustee | 14 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.