INSTITUTE FOR BIBLE TRANSLATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith by supporting the translation and printing of the Bible for the non-Slavic peoples of Russia and CIS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Bennett | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colin Philip Cleaver | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bronwen Cleaver | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anton Ponomarev | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev TIMOTHY JOHN HERBERT | Trustee | 09 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.39k | £27.54k | £60.27k | £60.27k | £52.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.22k | £40.84k | £46.24k | £46.24k | £62.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 FEB 2002 as amended on 23 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BY THE TRANSLATION AND PUBLICATION OF THE BIBLE AND OTHER RELIGIOUS LITERATURE IN LANGUAGES OF NON- SLAVIC PEOPLES LIVING IN RUSSIA AND OTHER COUNTRIES OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF INDEPENDENT STATES (CIS).
Area of benefit
RUSSIA AND OTHER COUNTRIES OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF INDEPENDENT STATES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rowheath Pavilion
Heath Road
Birmingham
County (Optional)
B30 1HH
- Phone:
- 01206502997
- Email:
- ibtuk@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window