THE CHARLES PEEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the trust is to apply the income and all or part of the capital at such time and in such manner for the advancement of education for the benefit of the community or such other exclusively charitable objects and purposes as the trustees may in their absolute discretion think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 June 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH MARGARET CUXSON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MR D K PICKARD | Trustee |
|
||||||||
CATHERINE ANNE PEEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
THOMAS DAVID PEEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CHARLES DAVID PEEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.16k | £66.33k | £24.52k | £26.51k | £28.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.52k | £66.66k | £57.69k | £52.77k | £52.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Veale Wasbrough Vizards Llp
24 King William Street
LONDON
EC4R 9AT
- Phone:
- 02074051234
- Email:
- mbyrne@vwv.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window