HERNE BAY AND WHITSTABLE CANCER SUPPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 13 July 2001: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 16 JUNE, 2001.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WITH CANCER OR PERSONS WHOSE LIVES HAVE BEEN AFFECTED BY CANCER IN HERNE BAY, WHITSTABLE AND SURROUNDING AREA PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND ADVICE.
Area of benefit
HERNE BAY AND WHITSTABLE, KENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window