COMMUNITY VOLUNTARY CAR SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Voluntary Car Service objectives are to promote the benefits of the residents of Lincolnshire without distinction of sex or of political, religious or other opinions by associating the statutory authorities, voluntary organisations and residents in a common effort to provide low cost transport service for persons who have a need of such a service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 19 July 2001: Standard registration
- 28 March 2022: Funds received from 247538 HUTTOFT RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Anne Firth | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Susan Burton | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|||||
BRIAN GIBNEY | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.34k | £31.74k | £38.31k | £28.58k | £16.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.11k | £29.85k | £52.06k | £35.96k | £26.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £32.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 09 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED 30 MAY 2001. AS AMENDED ON 11 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF LINCOLNSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND RESIDENTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE A LOW COST TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE DUE TO THEIR AGE, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL ISOLATION.
Area of benefit
LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Voluntary Car Service
4 Marine Avenue
Sutton-On-Sea
MABLETHORPE
Lincolnshire
LN12 2ND
- Phone:
- 01507442502
- Email:
- office@cvcssos.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window