Governing document OSBORNE PARTNERSHIP

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH DECEMBER 1997, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3RD APRIL 1998, 15TH MAY 2001 AND 29 MARCH 2004 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION RECORDED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 1 FEBRUARY 2010 as amended on 18 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
(I) RELIEF OF HARDSHIP FOR PEOPLE IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY WHO HAVE A LEARNING DISABILITY, PHYSICAL DISABILITY, MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEM OR OTHER RELATED DISADVANTAGED GROUPS. (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE SAME GROUPS OF PEOPLE DETAILED IN OBJECT (I) ABOVE. (III) THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN BARKING & DAGENHAM AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.