ADUR SPECIAL NEEDS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide weekend play schemes for all young people with disabilities aged between 5 and 15 years, on the second and fourth Saturdays of the month during school term times. Activities are fun-based and include support by paid staff. Activities include art and drama, cookery, music, indoor and out door games, sensory room, computers, reading, quiet time and occasional outings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 13 September 2001: Standard registration
- 12 September 2024: Funds received from 1116203 EXTRATIME
- ASP (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Jane Funnell | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sean Obrien | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hodgson | Trustee | 24 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Peter Rush | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Rush | Trustee | 28 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE TREVOR | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.71k | £47.59k | £51.30k | £53.59k | £59.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.42k | £36.47k | £44.03k | £45.41k | £50.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.47k | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/08/2001 AS AMENDED ON 14/09/2013 as amended on 28 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE PROJECT SHALL BE TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION, RECREATION AND CARE OF PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS THAT ARE NORMALLY RESIDENT IN SUSSEX AREA
Area of benefit
SUSSEX COUNTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
197 Brighton Road
LANCING
BN15 8JB
- Phone:
- 07788239634
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window