PORTSMOUTH CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 24 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yat Cheong Chiang | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Yu-Kwong Kan | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hon Kwong Cheung | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yuen Ting Lee | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MEI LENG FONG | Trustee | 02 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
EMILY CHEUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE WONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEX PUN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.07k | £61.53k | £34.24k | £45.09k | £76.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.67k | £15.92k | £12.92k | £22.56k | £27.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 June 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 03 June 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/08/2001 AS AMENDED ON 08/02/2014
Charitable objects
TO GLORIFY GOD BY PREACHING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST, PROMOTING AND ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AND BY PROVIDING CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONG MEMBERS OF THE CHINESE COMMUNITY IN PORTSMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
PORTSMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 Fratton Road
PORTSMOUTH
PO1 5DD
- Phone:
- 07772261306
- Email:
- portsmouthccc@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
portsmouthccc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window