THE OXFORD BUS MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAINTAINING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC A MUSEUM OF TRANSPORT CONTAINING VINTAGE BUSES, MORRIS CARS AND BICYCLES. MAINTAINING VEHICLES IN RUNNING ORDER AND RESTORING ACQUIRED VEHICLES. PROMOTING THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION OF BUSES AND OTHER VEHICLES OF LOCAL INTEREST, OF ACTUAL OR POTENTIAL HISTORIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 12 September 2001: Standard registration
- THE OXFORD BUS MUSEUM TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter James Pool | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Arnold Hendrick Jozef Nolten | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Sarah Lilian Powell | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirstin Louise Blackman | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashley James Blackman | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry John Freeman | Trustee | 12 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Sidney Palmer | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Graham Scott Poole | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julian Stuart Wells | Trustee | 08 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROLAND FRANK COLLINGWOOD | Trustee | 03 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Robert Paul Statham | Trustee | 27 October 2013 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS JOHN RAMAULT TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.41k | £95.94k | £77.95k | £58.33k | £72.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.23k | £57.76k | £61.58k | £70.61k | £74.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | £26.01k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JUNE 2001.
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC A MUSEUM OF TRANSPORT WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO BUSES HAVING AN ASSOCIATION WITH THE OXFORDSHIRE AREA AND FOR THE LIKE PURPOSE TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION OF BUSES AND OTHER VEHICLES OF LOCAL INTEREST OF ACTUAL OR POTENTIAL HISTORIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Station Yard
Main Road
Long Hanborough
Witney
Oxfordshire
OX29 8LA
- Phone:
- 01993 883617
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window