SHAKESPEARE SCHOOLS FESTIVAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
On 1st April 2016, Shakespeare Schools Festival became Shakespeare Schools Foundation, charity number 1164676 and limited company (England and Wales), number 9883201. Our annual Festival remains at the core of what we do and the new overall name acknowledges that we will continue to develop other activities consistent with our mission and values.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 July 2001: Standard registration
- 17 April 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 17 April 2019: Funds transferred to 1164676 Coram Shakespeare Schools Foundation
- SHAKESPEARE SCHOOLS DRAMA FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71m | £2.17m | £2.11m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.75m | £2.15m | £2.14m | £102.92k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £65.39k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £221.47k | £51.50k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £629.08k | £796.00k | £549.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £87.81k | £105.20k | £255.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £995.90k | £1.23m | £1.30m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £708 | £531 | £770 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £36.82k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.65m | £1.80m | £1.80m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £345.86k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.41k | £17.62k | £7.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 14 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED 25 NOVEMBER 2008 AND AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 2010. AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND ORGANISATION OF THE ACTING OF SHAKESPEARE’S PLAYS BY YOUNG PEOPLE IN SCHOOLS AND THEATRES THROUGHOUT THE UK AND ELSEWHERE, THEREBY DEVELOPING THOSE YOUNG PERSONS’ SELF-CONFIDENCE AND CREATIVITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window