ROMILEY LIFECENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a range of services from an attractive and accessible meeting place for all sectors of the community. Support for the depressed or bereaved, counselling & listening, courses to develop relationship and parenting skills, IT training. Support & training for 70 volunteers who service conference facilities, cafe, creche & Christian bookshop. Support programmes of young peoples work off site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Stockport
Governance
- 18 June 2001: Standard registration
- ROMILEY LIFECENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RICHARD PENNYSTAN | Chair | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Philip Harold Bray | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTIE GODDARD | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|||||
JANET FORD | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
|||||
IAN SCOON OTTO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.84k | £77.36k | £156.08k | £145.41k | £158.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.93k | £76.05k | £113.48k | £139.22k | £150.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £38.50k | £17.27k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 FEBRUARY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 MAY 2001 AND 7 SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 10 OCTOBER 2001.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ROMILEY, WOODLEY AND BREDBURY AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; AND (D) PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
ROMILEY, WOODLEY AND BREDBURY AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Stockport Road
Romiley
STOCKPORT
SK6 4BN
- Phone:
- 0161 430 1130
- Email:
- info@romileylifecentre.co.uk
- Website:
-
romileylifecentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window