TRIUMPHANT PRAYER MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are still doing the same things as it was in the beginning. We do preaching the word of God, giving hospitality to the poor, taken care of the elderly in our community. Also sending relief to the people in other parts of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Throughout London
- Ghana
- Haiti
- Israel
Governance
- 11 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kwame Odiaforko Dapaah | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.28k | £1.74k | £2.30k | £2.50k | £4.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.14k | £922 | £925 | £1.20k | £2.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 August 2022 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 AUGUST 2000.
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE SICK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 Silverleigh Road
Thornton Heath
CR7 6DZ
- Phone:
- 07984277973
- Email:
- kdkdapaah@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window