ANCHOR PRESS MUSEUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Anchor Press Museum activity was nil during the past year and is in the process of being wound up due to the inability to fund any progress. All items within the collection and remaining funds in account have been gifted to The St Bride Foundation (Reg. Charity No 207607) and the museum was listed in the London Gazette for striking off on 20th May 2014. Funds in the bank account are now ?0.00.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 14 May 2001: Standard registration
- 03 September 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 03 September 2014: Funds transferred to 207607 ST BRIDE FOUNDATION
- ANCHOR PRESS MUSEUM AND WORKSHOP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 28/02/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15 | £0 | £150 | £1.75k | £3.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | 01 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 17 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 10 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 20 March 2012 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
A. TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE THE PRINTING HERITAGE OF TIPTREE THAT EXISTED FORM 1900 UNTIL 1980 FOR THE EDUCATION AND LEISURE OF SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 ON PRINTING METHODS AND HISTORY THROUGH THE 20TH CENTURY AND OFFER THE ABILITY TO DEMONSTRATE THE TECHNIQUES INVOLVED. C. TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, RECONSTRUCT OR RESCUE FROM DESTRUCTION AND NEGLECT ANY ITEMS OF HISTORICAL SIGNIFICANCE RELATING TO PRINTING, BE IT DOCUMENTATION ON TAPE, PAPER OR FILM, OR MACHINERY, TOOLS AND MOVABLE TYPE AND TO KEEP SUCH ITEMS IN A WORKING MUSEUM. THIS WILL BE AVAILABLE FOR ALL MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC, SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, SOCIETIES AND MUSEUM MEMBERS TO ACHIEVE HANDS-ON EXPERIENCE, UNDER SUPERVISION,
Area of benefit
TIPTREE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window