Bishop Auckland and District U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bishop Auckland and District U3A is a learning organisation in which members teach each other. We meet for educational and recreational purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Darlington
- Durham
Governance
- 22 May 2001: Standard registration
- WEAR-TEES U3A (Previous name)
- WEAR-TEES UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerald Cumming | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan McGuire | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Stephens | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Strickland | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Hewitt | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Marsh | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Marsh | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Strickland | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Giles | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Scales | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terence James Bacon | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.32k | £32.28k | £13.98k | £17.68k | £42.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.02k | £34.54k | £4.86k | £2.59k | £44.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 July 2020 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 OCT 2018 as amended on 16 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
WEAR VALLEY DISTRICT AND TEESDALE DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
127 Watling Road
BISHOP AUCKLAND
County Durham
DL14 6RR
- Phone:
- 07802 705284
- Email:
- chair.baanddu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window