Financial history MEMORIAL HALL ARTS & LEISURE COMPANY

Charity Number: 1089233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £52.89k £63.04k £64.48k £72.35k £79.37k
Total expenditure £69.85k £56.74k £66.82k £80.66k £93.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.39k £14.80k £14.39k £14.39k £14.39k