Trustees MEMORIAL HALL ARTS & LEISURE COMPANY

Charity number: 1089233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Warren Whyte Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
ANNE PATRICIA BAMFORD Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
Gareth Wyre Trustee 27 November 2017
None on record
DR BRIAN HINTON Trustee 05 June 2017
None on record
Janet Cave Trustee 30 April 2014
None on record