WINSLOW HALL OPERA DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates, and seeks to attract funding for, a short season of opera normally in the summer of each year for the education of the public. A production of La Traviata took place in July 2015, of Don Giovanni in July 2016, of Un Ballo in Maschera in 2017, and of Il Trovatore in 2018.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 19 June 2001: Standard registration
- 26 September 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- STOWE OPERA DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.68k | £165.48k | £2.70k | £200 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.68k | £145.47k | £9.34k | £12.45k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 07 March 2022 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MUSIC, THEATRE AND THE PERFORMING ARTS WITH PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE, REFERENCE TO OPERA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window