Accounts and annual returns WITHERNSEA & DISTRICT OUT OF SCHOOL CLUBS

Charity number: 1091610
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 12 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 19 September 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2010 10 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 12 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2009 21 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required