WITHERNSEA & DISTRICT OUT OF SCHOOL CLUBS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Play activities/ learning through play
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 12 April 2002: Standard registration
- 08 March 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WROOSC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.29k | £76.03k | £12.90k | £44.67k | £40.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.57k | £72.14k | £12.88k | £42.61k | £34.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 12 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 19 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 10 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 12 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 21 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUNE 1998 AS AMENDED ON 26 MARCH 2001 AND 14 JUNE 2001.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window