Financial history HOUGHTON SCHOOL OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB

Charity Number: 1087230
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £39.35k £41.49k £47.28k £48.79k £45.04k
Total expenditure £36.72k £40.88k £39.82k £47.84k £46.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A