EAST ORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates East Ord Village Hall, Berwick upon Tweed. The Hall is used by many local charitable and amateur organisations. It is also hired out on occasions to professional bodies. The Committe are responsible for the hiring, maintenance and safety of the Village hall building and control of the finances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 20 June 2001: Standard registration
- EAST ORD PARISH HALL (Working name)
- ORD PARISH HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ROBERT GARLAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
William Forbes Grant | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Isabel Hunter | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Tait | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Hardy | Trustee | 21 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
GORDON EMMERSON GARLAND | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.62k | £13.38k | £19.52k | £7.87k | £7.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.20k | £5.54k | £5.35k | £6.79k | £8.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 27 OCTOBER 1959 AS AMENDED BY THE CHARITABLE TRUSTS (VALIDATION) ACT 1954
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
ORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 CORNWALL AVENUE
BERWICK-UPON-TWEED
TD15 2NX
- Phone:
- 01289305272
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window