THURROCK ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND CULTURAL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relegious Activities, Mosque
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Thurrock
Governance
- 28 September 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIRAJ ALI | Trustee |
|
||||||
HELAL UDDIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEMON UDDIN CHOWDHURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MONIR ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIRAJUL ISLAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELAL ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD ABUL KALAM AZAD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.62k | £57.78k | £141.52k | £90.23k | £163.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.05k | £38.87k | £35.14k | £38.90k | £46.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 March 2024 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 March 2024 | 272 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2022 | 337 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2022 | 337 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVE OF THE ASSOCIATION IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE BOROUGH OF THURROCK IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX (''THE AREA OF BENEFIT''), IN PARTICULAR MUSLIMS BY: (1) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION, INCLUDING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MOSQUE, AND (3) THE PROVISION OF RECREATION OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN THE INTERSECTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parkway Centre Mosque
Park Road
GRAYS
Essex
RM17 6RB
- Phone:
- 01375376823
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window