Financial history OLDFIELD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (BATH)

Charity number: 1088954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2020 01/09/2021 01/09/2022 01/09/2023 01/09/2024
Total gross income £5.20k £3.91k £3.91k £15.29k £12.83k
Total expenditure £4.26k £6.26k £6.26k £8.92k £9.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A