ROY WOODWARD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of grants to King Charles I School Kidderminster in respect of items not normally met by local education authority and subject there to the provision of grants to current and former pupils of the school for educational purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 30 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Gulliver | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Louise Rose Heath | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Joel Alan Douglas | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen John Wyer | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
ALAN JAMES NEAL | Trustee | 16 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||
LUCILLE GLENCAIRN CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.58k | £58.51k | £60.37k | £61.74k | £63.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.64k | £22.28k | £91.73k | £12.81k | £102.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 2 MARCH 1979
Charitable objects
11. (A) THE NET YEARLY INCOME OF THE FOUNDATION SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES - (I) IN PROVIDING SPECIAL BENEFITS FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT OF ANY KIND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL NOT USUALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE SCHOOL (II) IN SETTING ASIDE TO A RESERVE FUND SUCH SUM AS THE TRUSTEES THINK PRUDENT TO MEET THE COSTS OF EXTRAORDINARY BENEFITS WHICH IN THEIR DISCRETION THEY THINK FIT TO PROVIDE FOR THE SCHOOL (B) THE RESIDUE OF THE NET YEARLY INCOME OF THE FOUNDATION SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS - (1) IN AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO PURSUE AND CONTINUE THEIR EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO TRAVEL AT HOME OR ABROAD FOR SUCH PURPOSES; (II) IN AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES EXHIBITIONS, SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, (INCLUDING TECHNICAL OR PHYSICAL EDUCATION), UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES; (III) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES, ON LEAVING SCHOOL, A UNIVERSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING; (IV) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS TECHNICAL OR PHYSICAL EDUCATION, AND (V) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL, OR EX PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL (KING CHARLES THE FIRST'S SCHOOL KIDDERMINSTER).
Contact information
- Address:
-
ADAM HOUSE
BIRMINGHAM ROAD
KIDDERMINSTER
WORCESTERSHIRE
DY10 2SH
- Phone:
- 01562820181
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window