Accounts and annual returns YORK COMMUNITY FURNITURE STORE

Charity Number: 1087607
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 14 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 21 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 08 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 13 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 13 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 02 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 02 December 2004 On Time