ISIS CHAMBER ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects by the presentation of public concerts, and by such other ways as the Society shall determine from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sharon Curtis | Chair | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Hunter Smith | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW JOHN LACK | Trustee | 21 April 2006 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.32k | £0 | £0 | £1.12k | £5.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.90k | £161 | £88 | £1.78k | £5.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 September 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/05/1986 AS AMENDED ON 19/06/2001 AS AMENDED ON 13/05/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE, SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 HILL VIEW
HEADINGTON
OXFORD
OX3 8EB
- Phone:
- 01865 308112
- Email:
- sacurtis2@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window